U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10722
  • Case Name: Travis Reed Jennings, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Show Cause-Order to Appear and Show Cause (Order)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule H]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule G]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule D]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch) (any reason)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.