U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10721
  • Case Name: Ricky Jackson, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Show Cause-Order to Appear and Show Cause (Order)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch) (any reason)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fee Reminder - Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Pro Se Debtor)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.