U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10213
  • Case Name: Ramoutalaye Derenise Scroggins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CHAP Confirmation Hearing Continued - Do Not Use]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Relief from Stay (Fee)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Abandon (Fee)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - SHV]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 13 - No Exceptions]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.