U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Babineaux et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.