U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10310
  • Case Name: Wade T. Sauls, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Require Payroll Deduction]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee's Motion to Require Payroll Deduction]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.