U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10422
  • Case Name: Ronda L. Morrow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.