U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80215
  • Case Name: Valerie Ann Chesne
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Statement of Adjourning/Continuing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Notice Re:]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Pay Chapter 13 First Installment by Credit Card]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Pay Filing Fees in Installments for Chapter 7,12 or 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Pay Filing Fee in Installments for Chapter 7, 12 or 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Employee Income Records]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.