U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00494
  • Case Name: Garlington v. Dear et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Support (NOT Motions)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sec P - Deficiency Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [District Transfer In]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment re Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.