U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-02006
  • Case Name: Popielewski et al v. Stratigos Dynamics, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice or Stipulation of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdraw/Dismiss Document]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [New Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling Order - AP]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint (Fee)]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.