U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10066
  • Case Name: David Michael Dupre and Brandi LeBlanc Dupre
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Order)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Memo to Record]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.