U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10053
  • Case Name: Jordan R. Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Discharging Chapter 7 Debtor(s) - form]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Closing Chapter 7 No Asset Case]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Recission of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Deficiency for Financial Management - form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.