U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10062
  • Case Name: Timothy L. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CHAP Confirmation Hearing Continued - Do Not Use]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - SHV]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.