U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20168
  • Case Name: Paul Allen Cormier, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF Calendar Entry - For Text]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Expedite Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Withdrawal - Generic]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee Payment - Bankruptcy Case (New)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.