U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20167
  • Case Name: Stanley McClesh Cline and Brooklyn Ann Bower Cline
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Enroll Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Enroll Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.