U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-05444
  • Case Name: Erie et al v. GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • May 12, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 09, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.