U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01485
  • Case Name: Sam v. Byrd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.