U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00496
  • Case Name: Willis v. Ballance et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 13, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued - All (Form Included)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.