U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10735
  • Case Name: Christy A Gendusa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification About a Financial Management Course Db (PF)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Redact (Order)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Redact (Motion) (Use to file non-Transcript Redaction Request)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fixed Fee Employment Agreement Disclosure (Attorney-Client) B.R. 2016(b)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (PF)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule H]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule G]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule D]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Fixed Fee Employment Agreement Disclosure (Attorney-Client) B.R. 2016(b)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (PF)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule J]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule I]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule H]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule G]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule E/F]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule D]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule C]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule A/B]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.