U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10732
  • Case Name: John Fitzgerald Taylor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Objection]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Payment Advices]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Dismiss Case]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Certification About a Financial Management Course Db]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Set Hearing (Order) (AP) (BK)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Fee Reminder - Petition]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [zDocument]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.