U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10315
  • Case Name: Vanetia Renee Watson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Insurance Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Acknowledgement of Terms for Chapter 13 plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.