U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50317
  • Case Name: Catherine D. Strother
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [First Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7 - No Exceptions]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Amended Voluntary Petition - All Chapters]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sutton, Mark K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.