U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Logan, III v. New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Commission for the Port of New Orleans et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 05, 2025: [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel of Record]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.