U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10170
  • Case Name: Brian David Rogers, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Minute Entry]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Court Audio Docketed]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect PDF Attached - form]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedules A/B, G, H, I, or J]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Modified Chapter 13 Plan (post-confirmation)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Modified Chapter 13 Plan (post-confirmation)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Schedules A/B, G, H, I, or J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Objection]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Incur Debt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.