U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80222
  • Case Name: Brandon Alan Dyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Restrict Public Access]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Redact (Restrict Public Access) (Fee)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.