U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50322
  • Case Name: Justina Marie Bonner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Change of Address Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule I]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule H]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule G]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule D]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule C]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Ineligibility to Receive Ch 13 Discharge]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Ineligibility for Chapter 13 Discharge]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.