U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00686
  • Case Name: McIntyre v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 14, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 13, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 13, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 21, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.