U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Garrison Industrial Services Inc. v. Citgo Petroleum Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 14, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • May 14, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Motion Setting]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 30, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.