U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10744
  • Case Name: Jacqueline Jackson Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Receipt of Amendment Fee]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Amended Schedules D, E, F, E/F or Amended List of Creditors (Fee, if apply.)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Administrative Correction-PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing (Pro Se Debtor)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.