U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10321
  • Case Name: Robin D. Wright
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Proceeding Memo-Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Substitute Attorney at 341 Meeting]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Substitute Attorney at Creditors' Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Asset]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.