U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10748
  • Case Name: LOUELLA PEARL GIVENS-HARDING
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [zDocument]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fee Reminder - Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.