U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10323
  • Case Name: Connie F. Rumage
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Domestic Support Information]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Acknowledgement of Terms for Chapter 13 plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Acknowledgement of Terms for Chapter 13 plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.