U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20174
  • Case Name: Larvenia Delorse Celestine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.