U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00507
  • Case Name: Hardwell v. Jeff Hall Trucking L L C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Enroll as Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 17, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.