U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10755
  • Case Name: Anthony Fernando Chacon Leiva
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification About a Financial Management Course Db (PF)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Deficiency Satisfied]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal in re Chapter 13 Plan Cram Down or Lien Strip]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Amended Social Security Statement - Private (PF)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.