U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10754
  • Case Name: Courtney Palmer Crockett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Acknowledgment of Receipt of Documents by Debtor(s)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Affidavit (PF)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.