U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11412
  • Case Name: Chaka L. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued - SHV]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended or Supplement to Schedules I, J,J-2]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.