U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00761
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Kamau et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 30, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 21, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.