U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Passages, LLC v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.