U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Herbert v. St James Parish School Board
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 08, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Expedite]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Manual Attachment Received]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.