U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Carrier et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Joseph]
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 14, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Allowing Rule 26 Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report]
  • May 06, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.