U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10761
  • Case Name: Dominiece Jade Lacroix
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Interim Order (Sua Sponte) (Order)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Order)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [06Employ with Affidavit of Disinterestedness (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [120 day order]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.