U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-01030
  • Case Name: Beeland Properties, LLC v. TDP Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [U.S. Marshals Request for Service Form]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Citation of Garnishee]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Writ Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Application for Writ]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Application for Writ]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request for Additional Summons]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [U.S. Marshals Request for Service Form]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Writ Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Writ Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Application for Writ]
  • April 21, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Deficiency for Incorrect Event - form]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.