U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10325
  • Case Name: Samantha Deion Videau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Require Payroll Deduction]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee's Motion to Require Payroll Deduction]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Deficiency for Certificate of Service - form]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Amended Voluntary Petition ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Amended Voluntary Petition ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedule D]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedule C]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedule E/F]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedule D]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedule C]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedule A/B]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.