U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80232
  • Case Name: Dallas Spencer and Sally Terese Moore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Terminate Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Convert Case Chapter 13 to 7 (Fee)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Service of Tax Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.