U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10432
  • Case Name: Gerald Palmer Jeter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Notice of Withdrawal of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.