U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02482
  • Case Name: Barnum v. New Orleans City et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.