U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01418
  • Case Name: Norton et al v. American Western Home Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Voluminous Exhibits - Additional Exhibits to Main Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Voluminous Exhibits - Additional Exhibits to Main Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.