U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10326
  • Case Name: Marquite A Sneed
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [none]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Statement of Intention]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murray, Dwayne M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.