U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11038
  • Case Name: Jarrett L. Henry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [NOA Matters]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Avoid Lien]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Discharging Chapter 7 Debtor(s) - form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Sell]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.