U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10328
  • Case Name: Bertha Anne Lockett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Expediting Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.